California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill May 5, 2015