California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB142 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015