|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 601, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3070.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2635.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1564.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1089.) (pending re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|