California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1426 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015