Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |