Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1735.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |