Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1592.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |