California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1442 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/11/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1442AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 5, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members O'Donnell and Brough FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Sections 7318 and 8651.8 of, and to add Section 8623 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1442, as amended, O'Donnell. Motor vehicle fuel: gasohol. Existing law, the Motor Vehicle Fuel Tax Law, imposes a tax upon the privilege of distributing motor fuel and defines the term "gasohol" for purposes of that law. Gasohol is defined as all blends of gasoline and alcohol containing more than 15% gasoline. This bill would redefine gasohol to instead mean all blends of gasoline and alcohol containing more than 21% or a percentage determined by regulations adopted by the State Board of Equalization, as specified. Existing law, the Use Fuel Tax Law, imposes an excise tax for the use of fuel, as defined, and requires that the excise tax imposed upon ethanol or methanol containing not more than 15% gasoline or diesel fuels be 1/2 of that rate. That law provides for refunds for certain overpayments of tax within a specified time period. This  bill, beginning on and after January 1, 2013,   bill  would instead apply that discounted rate to ethanol or methanol containing not more than 21% gasoline, blended ethanol fuel, as defined, or diesel fuels. This bill would take effect immediately as a tax levy. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7318 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 7318. "Gasohol" means all blends of gasoline and alcohol containing more than 21 percent gasoline, or a percentage adopted by board regulation as specified in Section 8623. SEC. 2. Section 8623 is added to the Revenue and Taxation Code, to read: 8623. "Blended ethanol fuel" is defined as a fuel blend consisting of ethanol and gasoline that meets one of the following requirements: (a) Contains not more than 21 percent gasoline. (b) Contains not more than a percentage of gasoline, as specified by board regulation, that is consistent with the E-85 Fuel Ethanol Specifications of Section 2292.4 of Title 13 of the California Code of Regulations. SEC. 3. Section 8651.8 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 8651.8. (a)  (1)    Notwithstanding Section 8651, the excise tax imposed upon ethanol or methanol containing not more than  15   21  percent  gasoline   gasoline, blended ethanol fuel,  or diesel fuels shall be one-half the rate prescribed by Section 8651 for each gallon of fuel used.  (2) This subdivision shall only apply to ethanol, methanol, or diesel fuels sold before January 1, 2013.  (b) All references in this code to Section 8651 shall be deemed, with respect to the rate imposed upon blended ethanol fuel, ethanol, or methanol, to also refer to this section.  (c) Notwithstanding Section 8651, on or after January 1, 2013, the excise tax imposed on ethanol or methanol containing not more than 21 percent gasoline, blended ethanol fuel, or diesel fuels shall be one-half the rate prescribed by Section 8651 for each gallon of fuel used.   SEC. 4.   The Legislature finds and declares that this act serves a public purpose and does not constitute a gift of public funds within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XVI of the California Constitution.   SEC. 5.   SEC. 4.  This act provides for a tax levy within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect.