Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1145.) | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |