California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1446 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill June 23, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015