LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1449
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1449
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1449
Compare Versions
AB1449 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB1449 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1449 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1449 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1449 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1449 Amended January 13, 2016
AB1449 Amended January 5, 2016
AB1449 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1449 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1449 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB1449 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1449 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1449 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1449 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1449 Amended January 13, 2016
AB1449 Amended January 5, 2016
AB1449 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1449 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare