|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2808.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2331.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 856.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|