07/06/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 59, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/06/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/26/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1548.). | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.) | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |