Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1543.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1483.) | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |