California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015