|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 14. Page 3024.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2582.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 1791.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|