Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |