LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1492
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1492
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1492
Compare Versions
AB1492 Chaptered October 4, 2015
AB1492 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB1492 Amended September 4, 2015
AB1492 Amended August 31, 2015
AB1492 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1492 Amended June 29, 2015
AB1492 Amended April 30, 2015
AB1492 Amended April 15, 2015
AB1492 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1492 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1492 Chaptered October 4, 2015
AB1492 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB1492 Amended September 4, 2015
AB1492 Amended August 31, 2015
AB1492 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1492 Amended June 29, 2015
AB1492 Amended April 30, 2015
AB1492 Amended April 15, 2015
AB1492 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1492 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare