Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2015 | Read first time. To print. |