California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1500 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 16, 2015