LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1502
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1502
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1502
Action History
Assembly
02/01/2016
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2016
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
03/26/2015
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Assembly
03/02/2015
Read first time.
Assembly
03/01/2015
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
Assembly
02/27/2015
Introduced. To print.