|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6283.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6114.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 5128.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1444.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|