Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|