California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 9, 2015
Bill August 27, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015