|
08/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1786.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1110.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|