California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill May 19, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015