|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2750.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1350.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Ordered to Consent Calendar. (pursuant to motion in committee on April 29, 2015)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|