California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1519 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 15, 2015