Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 20. Page 5165.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wieckowski. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5165.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 973.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|