|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 382, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2689.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1561.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|