|
08/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 135, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1791.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|