07/15/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 113, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/15/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 1663.). | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1221.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 18. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2015 | Read first time. To print. |