|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2582.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1560.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|