Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 26. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |