|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2863.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2410.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|