|
07/14/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1618.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1446.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|