|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2342.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2430.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee May 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print. (Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54)
|
|
|