Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee June 20. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2015 | Read first time. To print. (Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54) |