California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1553 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2016

Amended

Bill August 10, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill February 29, 2016