LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1554
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1554
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1554
Compare Versions
AB1554 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1554 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB1554 Amended June 29, 2016
AB1554 Amended April 25, 2016
AB1554 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1554 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1554 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1554 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB1554 Amended June 29, 2016
AB1554 Amended April 25, 2016
AB1554 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1554 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare