California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Amended

Bill May 16, 2016
Bill April 28, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016
Bill February 25, 2016