California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1558 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/09/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1558CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 256 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 16, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 24, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mathis (Coauthor: Senator Berryhill) JANUARY 4, 2016 An act to add Section 23826.14 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1558, Mathis. Alcoholic beverages: licenses. The Alcoholic Beverage Control Act, administered by the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control, regulates the sale and distribution of alcoholic beverages and the granting of licenses for the manufacture, distribution, and sale of alcoholic beverages within the state. The act also provides for a limitation on the amount of on-sale general licenses that may be issued by the department based on the population of the county in which the licensed premises are located, as provided. This bill would provide an exception to this limitation for the County of Inyo, as specified. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations regarding the necessity of a special statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 23826.14 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 23826.14. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, in the County of Inyo, the department may issue no more than a total of five additional new original on-sale general licenses for bona fide public eating places, public premises, or both from January 1, 2017, to December 31, 2019, inclusive. To qualify for a license under this section, the premises upon which a bona fide public eating place is operated shall have a seating capacity for 50 or more diners. (b) In issuing the licenses provided for in this section, the department shall follow the procedure set forth in Section 23961. (c) This chapter does not prohibit a person that currently holds a valid on-sale general license for seasonal business from applying for an original on-sale general license pursuant to this section. (d) A license issued under this section shall not be transferred from one county to another, nor shall it be transferred to any premises not qualifying under this section. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique circumstances of the economy of the County of Inyo that apply only to the County of Inyo.