Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|