Assembly | 05/23/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | Read first time. To print. |