LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1567
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1567
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1567
Compare Versions
AB1567 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB1567 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1567 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1567 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1567 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1567 Amended May 27, 2016
AB1567 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1567 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1567 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB1567 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1567 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1567 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1567 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1567 Amended May 27, 2016
AB1567 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1567 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare