California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill June 27, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2016

Amended

Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016