|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 2730.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2290.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 712.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|