Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5018.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|