California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1575 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016