California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 10, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill March 9, 2016
Bill February 3, 2016